United States of America v. $100,000.00 in United States Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $100,000.00 in United States Currency
 
Case Number: 8:2012cv00223
Filed: June 29, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
 
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2013 31 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Claim 11 filed by Melanie Sia Vang.1) The Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline, previously set for February 7, 2013, is continued pending further order of the court. 2) Claimant Melanie Sia Vang is given 14 days, or until February 15, 2013, to file her answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint, in the absence of which her claim may be dismissed for want of prosecution without further notice.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
March 12, 2013 34 Featured Case ORDER - The Findings and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge (filing 32 ) are adopted. All claims brought by claimant Melanie Sia Vang are dismissed. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
March 12, 2013 35 Featured Case CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - upon consent of parties, this case is transferred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart for final disposition. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (JAB)
April 9, 2013 41 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The motion to withdraw filed by James K. McGough as counsel of record on behalf of Claimant Yang Chue Her, (filing no. 40 ), is granted. On or before April 29, 2013, Claimant Yang Chue Her shall either: (a) obtain the servi ces of counsel and have that attorney file an appearance in this case; or (b) file a statement notifying the court of her intent to litigate this case without the assistance of counsel. The failure to do so may result in a dismissal of her claims without further notice. Mr. McGough shall promptly mail a copy of this order to Claimant Yang Chue Her, and file a certificate of service stating the date and the manner of service, and the name and address served. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
April 9, 2013 42 Featured Case ORDER - The claimant's objection (filing 39 ) is overruled. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (GJG)
June 13, 2013 45 Featured Case ORDER granting 44 Motion to Strike. The claims of Melanie Sia Vang and Yang Chue Her are dismissed, with prejudice, for want of prosecution. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (BHC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. $100,000.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nancy A. Svoboda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $100,000.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]