Luevano v. Ruiz et al

Plaintiff: Jaime Luevano
Defendant: Gov. Rick Perry, R. Ruiz, Wardens and Sgt. De los Santos
Case Number: 8:2012cv00232
Filed: July 2, 2012
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: This matter is dismissed without prejudice for failure to pay the court's filing fee and for failure to comply with a court order. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. All pending Motions are denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
July 13, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is directed to correct the above-listed technical defect in the Complaint on or before August 13, 2012. Failure to comply with this Memorandum and Order will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. (Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 8/13/2012: Check for MIFP or payment) Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party with AO240 form as directed) (TEL)
October 1, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff shall have until October 31, 2012, to pay the entire $350.00 filing fee or submit a certified trust account statement in support of his Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. In the event that Plaintiff fails to comply with this Memorandum and Order, this matter will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the fol lowing text: October 31, 2012: Check for institutional trust account statement; Plaintiff's Notice of Appeal (Filing No. 8 ), construed as a motion for interlocutory appeal, is denied. Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint (Filing No. [ 5]) is granted. In the event that Plaintiff complies with this Memorandum and Order, the court will consider Plaintiff's Complaint, as amended. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 5 ) is denied as duplicative. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 7 ) remains pending. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luevano v. Ruiz et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Luevano
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gov. Rick Perry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Ruiz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wardens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. De los Santos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]