NUtech Ventures v. Syngenta Seeds, Inc. et al

Defendant: Trenton Agri Products LLC and Syngenta Seeds, Inc.
Plaintiff: NUtech Ventures
Case Number: 8:2012cv00289
Filed: August 15, 2012
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 22, 2013 115 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The Court construes the term "hyperthermophilic glycosyl hydrolase," appearing in Claim 1 of the '592 Patent, to mean "glycosyl hydrolase derived from organisms capable of growth above 70 C ." The Court construes the term "said substrate comprises extract of plant transformed with said recombinant hyperthermophilic glycosyl hydrolase," appearing in Claim 1 of the '592 Patent, to mean "the plant substrate include s extract of plant that has been transformed with the recombinant hyperthermophilic glycosyl hydrolase." The Court construes the term "wherein the glycosyl hydrolase is localized with the substrate in tissue of the plant," appearing in Claim 1 of the '592 Patent, to mean "wherein the glycosyl hydrolase and substrate of the transformed plant are located inside the same cell." Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TCL )
March 27, 2014 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: On or before May 5, 2014, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to Chief District Judge Laurie Smith Camp, at smithcamp@ned.uscourts. gov, a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. No further progression will be scheduled upon the representation that this case is settled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL )
April 16, 2014 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL - IT IS ORDERED: The parties' Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice (Filing No. 122 ) is approved. All claims in the above-captioned action are dismissed with prejudice. The parties will bear their own costs and attorney's fees. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TCL )
April 24, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED PROGRESSIN ORDER - granting 45 Joint Motion to Revise Progression Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the Progression Order (Doc. No. 37 ) shall be amended as set forth in this order. All other deadlines in the Progression Order shall remain unchanged. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL )
June 3, 2013 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the joint motion for a protective order (filing 55 ) is granted as set forth above. By June 13, 2013, the parties shall jointly submit to the Court an amended proposed order which incorporates the decision of the Court as delineated herein. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL)
June 13, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Interrogatory Responses (filing 52 ) is granted, in part, as set forth above. Defendant Trenton shall supplement its response to Interrogatory No. 2 at issue in this Motion and Syngenta shall supplement its responses to Interrogatory Nos. 3 and 6 at issue in this Motion. Defendants shall supplement their responses within 45 days of this Order. Plaintiff's Motion is otherwise denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL )
June 14, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NUtech Ventures v. Syngenta Seeds, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trenton Agri Products LLC
Represented By: Gerald L. Friedrichsen
Represented By: Mishele N. Kieffer
Represented By: Russell E. Levine
Represented By: Serena J. Pruitt
Represented By: Hari Santhanam
Represented By: Marcus E. Sernel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta Seeds, Inc.
Represented By: Gerald L. Friedrichsen
Represented By: Mishele N. Kieffer
Represented By: Russell E. Levine
Represented By: Serena J. Pruitt
Represented By: Hari Santhanam
Represented By: Marcus E. Sernel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NUtech Ventures
Represented By: Matthew M. Enenbach
Represented By: John C. Adkisson
Represented By: Jeremy T. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: William R. Woodford
Represented By: Limin Zheng
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]