United States of America v. $1,074,900.00 in United States Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $1,074,900.00 in United States Currency
 
Case Number: 8:2012cv00297
Filed: August 24, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2012 27 Featured Case ORDER - The claimant's Motion for Order Changing Venue (Filing No. 11 ) is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (AOA)
January 29, 2013 44 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The plaintiff's motion to strike, Filing No. 32 , is denied. The F&R of the magistrate judge, Filing No. 42 , is adopted in its entirety. The plaintiff's objections to the magistrate judge's F&R, Filing No. 43 , are overruled. The magistrate judge is ordered to progress this case. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (AOA)
January 29, 2013 45 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The claimant's motion to change venue, Filing No. 11 , is denied. The objections of the claimant, Filing No. 35 , are overruled. The order of the magistrate judge, Filing No. 27 , is affirmed in its entirety. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (AOA)
August 1, 2013 68 Featured Case ORDER - Claimant Tasha Mishra's motion for attorney fees (Filing No. 67 ) is granted. Attorney fees will be awarded to the claimant in an amount to be later determined by the court. Claimants counsel shall provide the court with itemized timesheets or billing records and affidavits as to the reasonableness of hourly rates, and shall disclose any fee agreements, within 14 days of the date of this order. The United States shall file any response or objection thereto within 7 days of the filing of the claimant's submission. The claimant shall file a verified bill of costs in accordance with Local Rule 54.1(b) on or before August 19, 2013. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (AOA)
November 26, 2013 84 Featured Case ORDER - The United States shall file any response or objection to the claimants submissions with respect to attorney fees and costs (Filing No. 69 , Filing No. 70 , Filing No. 71 , and Filing No. 72 ) within 7 days of the date of this order. T he claimant shall file any response thereto within 7 days thereafter, at which time the matter will be deemed submitted. Claimant Tara Mishras Application for an Order Directing the United States Government to Return Money by Way of Wire Transfer or Check to the Trust Account for the Claimants Attorney, Filing No. 83, is granted. The United States is directed to issue payment in satisfaction of the judgment for the funds at issue, $1,074,900 in United States currency, plus interest at the legal rate from and after March 3, 2012, by way of wire transfer or check for deposit in the client trust account of Roger Jon Diamond, Attorney at Law, at OneWest Bank, Santa Monica, CA. Judgment for attorney fees will be awarded in a separate order.Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (AOA)
January 27, 2014 87 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Claimant's motion for attorney fees, Filing No. 67 , is granted. The government is ordered to pay $39,035.00 directly to the claimant, Tara Mishra. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. $1,074,900.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nancy A. Svoboda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $1,074,900.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]