United States of America v. $33,980.00 in United States Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $33,980.00 in United States Currency
Case Number: 8:2012cv00300
Filed: August 27, 2012
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Email Motion to cancel the Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Conference is canceled. Pretrial Conference Memo should be e-mailed to Magistrate Judge Zwart by August 21, 2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
August 14, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The U.S. Marshals Service is directed to return $11,315.00 of the defendant property to the claimant, Joseph G. Gannon, by making payment to the trust account of his attorney of record, Adam J. Sipple. The remaining defendant property , $22,665.00, is forfeited to the United States and shall be disposed of by the U.S. Marshals Service. The plaintiff and the claimant shall each bear their own costs and attorney fees. Upon receipt of the tendered funds, Mr. Sipple shall f ile a notice showing such receipt. Upon the filing of Mr. Sipple's receipt, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal which will fully dispose of this case. This case is removed from the Court's trial docket. The Clerk of the Court shall set a dismissal papers deadline of September 13, 2013. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (1 Certified copy to USM)(AOA)
November 7, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Joint Motion (filing 34 ) is granted. A conference is set for November 22, 2013, at 12:00 p.m., in the chambers of the Special Proceedings Courtroom of the Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska. The deadline for complying with the Court's order of August 14, 2013 (filing 29 ), will be set following the conference. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (AOA)
December 2, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the joint Stipulation for Dismissal filed by plaintiff and claimant Joseph G. Gannon (filing 37), this Court's order of August 14, 2013 (filing 29 ), and the previous stipulation filed by plaintiff and claimant (filing 28), this case is dismissed, with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and fees. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $33,980.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nancy A. Svoboda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $33,980.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]