United States of America v. $45,000.00 in United States Currency and 2001 Itasca Suncruiser Mobile Home, VIN5B4LP57G013332941

Claimant: Hugo L Soto
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $45,000.00 in United States Currency and 2001 Itasca Suncruiser Mobile Home, VIN5B4LP57G013332941
 
Case Number: 8:2012cv00320
Filed: September 10, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The plaintiff's Consent Motion to Move Place of Trial (Filing No. 21 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court shall present this case to the Chief Judge for reassignment, in accordance with NEGenR 1.4(a)(2) and (3), to one of the participatin g judges from the docket for which this case would be assigned on a random basis if it had originally been filed in Lincoln, Nebraska. The previously scheduled suppression hearing on January 24, 2013, is cancelled. The Clerk of Court shall amend the docket in this matter to reflect the place of trial is Lincoln, Nebraska. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (GJG)
December 19, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Soto's objection (filing 41 ) is overruled. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (AOA)
July 2, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - The parties are ordered to show cause why this case (including counterclaims and the like) should not be dismissed. Any response must be received on or before July 18, 2014. Absent compliance with this order, this case will be dismissed without further notice. The Clerk of the Court shall set a dismissal papers deadline of July 18, 2014. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. $45,000.00 in United States Currency and 2001 Itasca Suncruiser Mobile Home, VIN5B4LP57G013332941
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Hugo L Soto
Represented By: Matt Catlett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nancy A. Svoboda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $45,000.00 in United States Currency and 2001 Itasca Suncruiser Mobile Home, VIN5B4LP57G013332941
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]