Uttecht et al v. Napolitano et al

Plaintiff: Sanjuana Uttecht, Silas Uttecht, Thomas Uttecht, Asher Uttecht, Benjamin Uttecht, Leah Uttecht and Phoebe Uttecht
Defendant: Eric Holder, Janet Napolitano, Scott Baniecke and Mark Foxall
 
Case Number: 8:2012cv00347
Filed: September 26, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 3 . On or before December 3, 2012, defendants shall provide a bond hearing to determine whether continued encroachment on the plaintiffs liberty interests is necessary in light of any credible government assertions that plaintiff Sanjuana Uttecht is a danger to the community or is a flight risk. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (AOA)
December 11, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the 21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Assistant United States Attorneys Laurie M. Barrett and Christopher L. Ferretti are deemed withdrawn as counsel of record for Mark Foxall, Director, Department of Corrections, Douglas County. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
April 4, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 25 Motion to Dismiss. A separate order will be entered in accordance with this memorandum opinion. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (AOA)
September 27, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The clerk of the court shall refund to plaintiff Thomas Uttecht, 2101 North Eastwood Street, Norfolk, Nebraska, 68701, the sum of $345.00. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy given to Finance)(AOA)
October 4, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Defendants shall file a response to plaintiffs' emergency motion for injunctive relief (Filing No. 3 ) on or before October 10, 2012. Plaintiffs shall have until October 22, 2012, to respond to defendants' submission. If plaintiffs do not intend to respond, they shall advise the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Uttecht et al v. Napolitano et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanjuana Uttecht
Represented By: Robert A. Perkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silas Uttecht
Represented By: Robert A. Perkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Uttecht
Represented By: Robert A. Perkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asher Uttecht
Represented By: Robert A. Perkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Uttecht
Represented By: Robert A. Perkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Uttecht
Represented By: Robert A. Perkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phoebe Uttecht
Represented By: Robert A. Perkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Holder
Represented By: Christopher L. Ferretti
Represented By: Laurie M. Barrett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Napolitano
Represented By: Laurie M. Barrett
Represented By: Christopher L. Ferretti
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Baniecke
Represented By: Christopher L. Ferretti
Represented By: Laurie M. Barrett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Foxall
Represented By: Christopher L. Ferretti
Represented By: Laurie M. Barrett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]