Whitt v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Jared L. Whitt
Case Number: 8:2012cv00358
Filed: October 5, 2012
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2014 161 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 101 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 111 Motion in Limine. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (JSF)
August 15, 2014 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 147 defendant's Motion to Continue Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of Case. The parties shall have an extension of time until October 30, 2014, to complete discovery related to the plain tiff's medical condition and IME. Although the parties shall comply with the previously imposed deadline to file witness lists, the parties shall have an extension of time until September 30, 2014, to supplement those lists, if necessary due to the plaintiff's recent medical evidence. The defendant's motion is denied in all other respects. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JAB)
August 20, 2014 171 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 170 the parties' Stipulation and Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
September 4, 2014 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER upon notice of settlement given to the magistrate judge on September 4, 2014. On or before October 6, 2014, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to the Ho norable Joseph F. Bataillon, at bataillon@ned.uscourts.gov, a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. If the case is being dismissed, the stipulation shall comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) and shall state whether the dismissal is w ith or without prejudice. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The previously scheduled pretrial conference and trial are cancelled upon the representation that this case is settled. Additionally, all pending motions are terminated as moot. ( Dismissal Papers Deadline due by 10/6/2014). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
September 19, 2014 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE on the parties Stipulation for Dismissal with prejudice 184 . This action is dismissed, with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and complete record waived. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (MKR)
February 13, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER FOR INITIAL PROGRESSION OF CASE granting 17 Motion to Amend. A telephone conference with the undersigned magistrate judge will be held on August 16, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. for the purpose of reviewing the preparation of the case to da te and the scheduling of the case to trial. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call. Trial is tentatively set for the month of March, 2014, and is tentatively scheduled for five days trial days. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB, )
July 9, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND AMENDED ORDER FOR INITIAL PROGRESSION OF CASE granting 38 Motion to Extend. Planning Conference set for 11/8/2013 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Trial is tentatively scheduled for five trial days beginning July 2014. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB, )
September 24, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 47 plaintiff's Second Motion to Amend Complaint. The plaintiff shall have until 10/7/2013 to file the Second Amended Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
November 14, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER granting Stipulated Motion 71 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JAB)
February 7, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 85 the defendant's Motion for Extension of Deadline to File Motions in Limine. The defendant shall have until February 24, 2014, to file a motion in limine challenging the admissibility of Mr. Gavalla's testimony pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitt v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: David J. Schmitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared L. Whitt
Represented By: James L. Cox, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]