Anderson v. The Nebraska Medical Center

Plaintiff: Brian A Anderson
Defendant: The Nebraska Medical Center
Case Number: 8:2012cv00390
Filed: November 5, 2012
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Defendant's Motion to Strike (filing 5 ) is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (AOA)
July 1, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER - Pursuant to the parties Stipulation for Protective Order filing 31 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
November 27, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and Responses to Requests for Production of Documents and Request for Sanctions (filing 43 ) is granted, in part. Within ten (10) days of this Order, Defendant shall supple ment its responses to Interrogatory Nos. 2 and 5, as well as its responses to Request Nos. 5 and 9. This supplemental production shall include Plaintiff's W-2's and pay stubs from the last five years of Plaintiff's employment with De fendant should these documents be in Defendant's possession, custody or control. The supplementation shall also include a statement of the dollar cost of all insurance and other benefits provided by Defendant to Plaintiff during the last five years of Plaintiff's employment with Defendant. Plaintiff's request for sanctions is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (AOA)
December 27, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Motion for Summary Judgment submitted by Defendant The Nebraska Medical Center (Filing No. 51 ) is granted. The Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Filing No. 7 ) is dismissed, with prejudice. A separate Judgment will be issued. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. The Nebraska Medical Center
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian A Anderson
Represented By: Aaron F. Smeall
Represented By: Kevin J. McCoy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nebraska Medical Center
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]