MRL Crane Service, Inc. v DLL, L.L.C.

Plaintiff: MRL Crane Service, Inc.
Third Party Defendant: Adams Building Contractors, Inc.
Defendant: DLL, L.L.C.
Third Party Plaintiff: DLL, L.L.C.
Case Number: 8:2012cv00419
Filed: December 6, 2012
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint (Filing No. 35 ) is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
January 8, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that: On or before February 7, 2014, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to the Honorable Joseph F. Bataillon, at bataillon@ned.usco urts.gov, a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. If the case is being dismissed, the stipulation shall comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) and shall state whether the dismissal is with or without prejudice. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The previously scheduled pretrial conference and trial are cancelled upon the representation that this case is settled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
February 13, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - NOW on this 13th day of February, 2014, this matter came on for consideration upon stipulation of the parties. After being duly advised in the premises, the above-captioned matter is hereby dismissed without prejudice, with each party to pay their own costs. IT IS SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MRL Crane Service, Inc. v DLL, L.L.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MRL Crane Service, Inc.
Represented By: Mark T. Porto
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party defendant: Adams Building Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: Steven D. Davidson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DLL, L.L.C.
Represented By: Tanya J. Hansen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party plaintiff: DLL, L.L.C.
Represented By: Tanya J. Hansen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]