Heyne v. Mitsubishi Motors North America et al

Defendant: Unknown insurance company of Mitsubishi Motors North America Inc., Unknown insurance company of Mitsubishi Motor Corporation and Mitsubishi Motors North America
402) 341-0396 (fax: Todd M. Heyne
Parent Company: Mitsubishi Motors Corporation
Case Number: 8:2012cv00421
Filed: December 10, 2012
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - To obtain service of process on Defendants, Plaintiff must complete andreturn the summons forms that the Clerk of the court will provide. The Clerk of the court shall send FOUR summons forms and FOUR USM-285 forms to Plaintif f, together with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Plaintiff shall, as soon as possible, complete the forms and send the completed forms back to the Clerk of the court. In the absence of the forms, service of process cannot occur. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: December 16, 2013: Check for completion of service of summons. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy order e-mailed to pro se party; summonses and forms sent via U.S. Mail.)(GJG )
January 8, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding Memorandum and Order 11 . To date, plaintiff has not filed any return of service indicating service on the defendants, and the defendants have not entered a voluntary appearance. The plaintiff is given until February 7, 2014< /b>, to serve his summons and complaint on the defendants, in the absence of which this case may be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) or for want of prosecution. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
March 12, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 14 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend. The plaintiff is granted an additional 45 days to serve his complaint and summons on the defendants. The plaintiff shall, as soon as possible, complete the USM-285 forms and the summons forms and return them to the Clerk of the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party with 4 summons and 285 forms)(JAB)
May 14, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Plaintiff shall have until May 30, 2014 to show cause why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) or for want of prosecution. The failure to timely comply with this order may result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
July 23, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendation (filing 19 ) are adopted in part. The plaintiff's objection (filing 20 ) is overruled. The plaintiff's claims against two unknown insurance companies are dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rules 4(m) and 41(b). The Clerk of the Court is directed to sign filings 6 and 7, complete forms USM-285 and USM-94 and any other required forms, and forward them to the United States Marshals Service along with copies of the plaintiff's amended complaint (filings 9 and 9-1). The Marshals Service shall service the summonses and amended complaint without payment of costs or fees. The Clerk of the Court shall set a case management deadline in this case for October 21, 2014, with the following text: "Check completion of service of summons." Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party; Copy to USM with Documents as ordered)(GJG)
July 24, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Clerk of the Court shall complete form USM-94 to request service by delivery to the addressee, if the addressee accepts it voluntarily. The Clerk of the Court shall provide two copies of the completed USM-94, and two c opies of the plaintiff's complaint (filings 9 and 9 -1) to the United States Marshal. The United States Marshal shall sign the duplicate USM-94 forms and mail the documents to the Japanese central authority by international air mail. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (1 Certified copy to USM)(GJG)
November 5, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall reset the case management deadline in this case for January 26, 2015, with the following text: "Check completion of service of summons." Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (JSF)
January 14, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The leave to proceed in forma pauperis 2 is provisionally granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
March 28, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff shall have until April 29, 2013, to file an amended complaint that gives Defendants fair notice of what his claims against them are and the grounds upon which they rest. Plaintiff shall have until April 29, 2013, to file sufficient evidence with the court showing that the amount in controversy is greater than $75,000.00, the jurisdictional amount. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the follo wing text: April 29, 2013: deadline for Plaintiff to file amended complaint and show jurisdictional amount by preponderance of evidence. The court reserves the right to conduct further review of Plaintiff's claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2) after Plaintiff addresses the matters set forth in this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heyne v. Mitsubishi Motors North America et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown insurance company of Mitsubishi Motors North America Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown insurance company of Mitsubishi Motor Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Motors North America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
402) 341-0396 (fax: Todd M. Heyne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Parent company: Mitsubishi Motors Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]