Bremmer et al v. Appleton Electric, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Waste Connections, Inc. and Rick Bremmer
Defendant: Emerson Electric, LLC and Appleton Electric, LLC
Case Number: 8:2012cv00436
Filed: December 20, 2012
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 21, 2014 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Bremmer's Motion to Intervene; Waive or Delay order on Costs and Fees Prior to Refiling; and Extend Case Progression Deadlines (Filing No. 82 ) is denied. The defendants' Motion to Strike (Filing No. 89 ) is granted. The plaintiff's Motion to Continue and Extend Deadlines (Filing No. 97 ) is denied. The plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Filing No. 102 ) is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
May 1, 2014 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The defendants' Application for Fees (Filing No. 117 ) is granted. The defendants are awarded reasonable costs and attorney's fees in the amount of $2,846.90, for having to file the motion to compel (Filing No. 79 ). The plaintiff and his attorney, Christopher A. Sievers, shall have forty-five days from the date of this Order to pay the defendants the sum of $2,846.90, and file verification of payment with the court. Counsel for the parties sh all confer on a reasonable amount to be awarded for the costs and fees expended in conducting a second Rule 30(b)(6) deposition and, if there is agreement, shall file on or before May 5, 2014, a stipulation of the costs and fees to be awarded. In the event the parties fail to reach an agreement, the defendants may file on or before May 6, 2014, an application for the award of the costs and fees accompanied by an affidavit of such costs and fees, pursuant to Civil Rules of the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska 54.3 and 54.4. The plaintiff shall have until on or before May 7, 2014, to respond to the defendants' application. Thereafter, the issue of costs and sanctions regarding the second Rule 30(b)(6) deposition will be deemed submitted and a written order entered. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
May 6, 2014 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the plaintiff's 130 Motion in Limine is granted in part and denied in part as explained above. The defendants' 134 Motion in Limine is granted in part and denied in part as explained above. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB)
May 8, 2014 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Emerson's 150 Motion for Leave and Motion for Summary Judgment [150-1]. WCI's Motion to Strike 156 is denied. WCI's claims against Emerson are dismissed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
May 8, 2014 188 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Appleton's 145 Motion for Leave and 154 Motion in Limine. WCI's Motion for Certain Witnesses to Appear by Deposition is granted in part and denied in part as set forth within the order 155 . WCI's 158 Motion for Leave to Depose Witness is denied. Appleton's 175 Motion for Protective Order is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
May 9, 2014 191 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Appleton's 171 Application for Fees. Appleton is awarded reasonable costs and attorneys fees in the amount of $2,091.15, for having to prepare for and take a second deposition. The plaintiff and his attorney, Christopher A. Sievers, shall have forty-five days from the date of this Order to pay Appleton the sum of $2,091.15, and file verification of payment with the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
May 12, 2014 197 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 178 the plaintiff's Motion to Strike Late Expert Report and Supplemental Motion in Limine. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken.(BJC)
June 3, 2014 236 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff's request for taxable costs is denied without prejudice to Plaintiff refiling on or before June 14, 2014 in compliance with the Bill of Costs Handbook for the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (BHC)
July 1, 2014 244 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - This matter is before the court on the defendant's, Appleton Electric, LLC (Appleton), Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, or alternatively, for a New Trial (Filing No. 239 ). In order to appropriately review Appletons motion, the court requires the transcript of the trial proceedings. Therefore, Appleton shall contact the court reporters and order the transcription. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
May 15, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part the plaintiffs' 30 Motion to Compel. The plaintiffs' motion is granted with regard to Interrogatory No. 3, as amended by the court, and denied in all other respects. On or before May 31, 201 3, the defendants shall amend its answer to Interrogatory No. 3 as provided in this order. Pursuant to NECivR 72.2 any objection to this Order shall be filed with the Clerk of the Court within fourteen (14) days after being served with a copy of this Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
August 21, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying the defendants' 46 Motion to Compel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
December 20, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE granting 72 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/24/2014 at 10:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Jury Trial set for 5/12/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
March 27, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the defendants' 79 Motion to Compel. The plaintiff shall designate a knowledgeable and prepared corporate representative to offer testimony concerning the matters for examination at the defendants' convenience and bear th e costs and fees associated with the additional deposition. The defendants are also awarded reasonable costs and attorney's fees incurred in filing the motion to compel. Counsel for the parties shall confer on a reasonable amount to be awarded and, if there is agreement, shall file on or before April 11, 2014, a stipulation of the costs and fees to be awarded. In the event the parties fail to reach an agreement, the defendants may file on or before April 14, 2014, an application for th e award of the costs and fees accompanied by an affidavit of such costs and fees, pursuant to Civil Rules of the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska 54.3 and 54.4. The plaintiff shall have until on or before April 18, 2014, to respond to the defendants' application. Thereafter, the issue of costs and sanctions will be deemed submitted and a written order entered. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bremmer et al v. Appleton Electric, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waste Connections, Inc.
Represented By: Josh F. Henningsen
Represented By: Christopher A. Sievers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Bremmer
Represented By: Christopher A. Sievers
Represented By: Josh F. Henningsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerson Electric, LLC
Represented By: Joseph C. Orlet
Represented By: David M. Newman
Represented By: Brandan Mueller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Appleton Electric, LLC
Represented By: Joseph C. Orlet
Represented By: David M. Newman
Represented By: Brandan Mueller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]