Birge v. Brumbaugh & Quandahl, P.C., LLO et al

Defendant: Midland Funding, Sara E. Miller, Mark Quandahl, Brumbaugh & Quandahl, P.C., LLO and Kirk E. Brumbaugh
Plaintiff: Lisa Birge
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00008
Filed: January 7, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion to Extend. The parties shall have until April 18, 2013, to submit their Rule 26 Meeting Report. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
March 28, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion to Extend. All deadlines in this action are extended for sixty days. The parties shall file a status report as to the outcome of the settlement conference on or before April 26, 2013. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
July 15, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that after conferring with the parties, an additional telephone conference is scheduled before the undersigned magistrate judge on July 19, 2013 at 3:00 p.m. to discuss the status of the parties' settlement discussions. Between now and the conference call on July 19, 2013, the parties shall diligently and in good faith attempt to resolve the final issues which have stalled completing the settlement of this case. The court will provide call-in information for the conference call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JSF)
July 18, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 31 Motion for Hearing. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ADB)
January 17, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 47 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall have until 1/24/14 to respond to plaintiff's 44 Motion for Attorney Fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
January 28, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the brief and index are deemed timely filed and the motion for extension of time 49 is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
February 20, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION that the MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs 44 will be granted in part. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
February 20, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND JUDGMENT that the 44 Motion for Attorney Fees is granted in part. The plaintiff is awarded fees in the amount of $11,220 for the services of O. Randall Bragg; $7,315.00 for the services of Pamela Car; $8,712.50 for the services of William Reinbrecht; and $62.50 for the services of paralegal Shannon Carter, for a total attorney fee award of $27,310.00. Costs in the amount of $1,405.33 are awarded. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Birge v. Brumbaugh & Quandahl, P.C., LLO et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara E. Miller
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Culhane
Represented By: Joseph E. Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Quandahl
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Culhane
Represented By: Joseph E. Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brumbaugh & Quandahl, P.C., LLO
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Culhane
Represented By: Joseph E. Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk E. Brumbaugh
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Culhane
Represented By: Joseph E. Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Birge
Represented By: William L. Reinbrecht
Represented By: Pamela A. Car
Represented By: O. Randolph Bragg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]