Kellum v. PNS Stores, Inc.

Defendant: PNS Stores, Inc. and Big Lots Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Allen Kellum
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00021
Filed: January 14, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451 Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: That, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), the plaintiff's cause of action against the defendants Big Lots, Inc., and Big Lots Stores, Inc., is hereby dismissed, without prejudice, and with costs taxed to the parties incurring the same. Upon dismissal, the caption of this case will be revised to reflect this dismissal and shall read "Allen Kellum, Plaintiff, v. PNS Stores, Inc., Defendant. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL )
September 6, 2013 31 Featured Case JOINT CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
January 3, 2014 34 Featured Case ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that: On or before February 28, 2014, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to the Honorable Joseph F. Bataillon, at bataillon@ned.us courts.gov, a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. If the case is being dismissed, the stipulation shall comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) and shall state whether the dismissal is with or without prejudice. Absent compliance with thi s order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The previously scheduled pretrial conference and trial are cancelled upon the representation that this case is settled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kellum v. PNS Stores, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNS Stores, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Lots Stores, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Kellum
Represented By: Jerry W. Katskee
Represented By: Andy L. Maca
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]