Morriss v. BNSF Railway Company

Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: Melvin A Morriss , III
Case Number: 8:2013cv00024
Filed: January 15, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 2, 2014 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 113 Motion to Continue. Each party shall have until September 9, 2014, to file a reply brief regarding their cross-motions for summary judgment 96 and 99 . Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JSF)
November 20, 2014 122 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendant's motion to restrict access to documents 95 is granted, and, pursuant to NEGenR 1.3(a)(1)(B)(ii), access to filings 97 and 98 shall be restricted to attorneys of record and court users. Defendant's mo tion to strike reply brief 118 is denied. Defendant's motion for summary judgment 96 is granted, and Plaintiff's action is dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment 99 is denied. Judgment shall be entered by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (SLP)
June 4, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the plaintiff's 14 Motion to Continue is granted. The deadline for identifying expert witnesses expected to testify at the trial is August 2, 2013. The deadlines for complete expert disclosures, (both retained expe rts, (Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(B)), and non-retained experts, (Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(C)), are: For the plaintiff(s): September 3, 2013; For the defendant(s): October 3, 2013; For the plaintiff rebuttal: October 17, 2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB)
August 1, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER adopting 18 Joint Stipulation and Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
October 16, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 Motion to Extend ; granting 25 Motion to Continue> Jury Trial set for 7/7/2014 at 09:00 AM Courtroom 1 (Special Proceedings), Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plz, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. Pretrial Conference set for 6/24/2014 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
January 13, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the plaintiff's motion to compel 32 , and the defendant's motion for protective order 52 , are each granted in part and denied in part as set forth in this order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JSF)
February 5, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED PROGRESSION ORDER that the joint motion to continue the deposition and dispositive motions deadlines 72 , is granted, as follows: 1) The deposition deadline is March 31, 2014. 2) The deadline for filing motions to dismiss and motions for sum mary judgment is April 15, 2014. 3) The deadline for filing motions to exclude testimony on Daubert and related grounds is April 15, 2014. 4) All other deadlines within the progression order remain in effect. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JSF)
April 6, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 78 Motion to Continue. The summary judgment and Daubert motion deadlines, and the trial and pretrial conference dates, are continued pending further order of the court. A telephonic conference is set for 4/29/2014 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morriss v. BNSF Railway Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin A Morriss , III
Represented By: Ari D. Riekes
Represented By: Jennifer L. Turco Meyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]