Reimers v. JBS USA, LLC et al

Defendant: JBS USA, LLC
Plaintiff: Carolyn K. Reimers
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00042
Filed: February 4, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2013 20 Featured Case ORDER - This matter is before the court on the defendant's Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial Date (Filing No. 19 ). The defendant seeks a one-month continuance of the trial setting. The motion is granted and the non-jury trial is rescheduled to commence, at the court's call, during the week of April 21, 2014, in Omaha, Nebraska, before the Honorable Joseph F. Bataillon. IT IS SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
January 15, 2014 24 Featured Case ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The pretrial conference previously scheduled for February 14, 2014, is canceled. The Final Pretrial Conference with the undersigned magistrate judge is rescheduled for March 28, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. in chambers, Suite 2271, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska. On or before March 7, 2014, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(3), each party shall serve opposing counsel and file a redacted version, as applicable, with a list of all exhibits it expects to offer at trial, other than solely for impeachment, by providing a numbered listing and permitting examination of such exhibits, designating on the list those exhibits it may offer only if the need arises. Any motions in limine shall be filed on or before March 21, 2014. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL, )
May 23, 2014 30 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff's motions for new trial (Filing No. 27 and Filing No. 28 ) are taken under advisement until June 6, 2014 pending further pleadings or submissions by the plaintiff. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL )
June 25, 2014 31 Featured Case ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's motions for a new trial, Filing No. 27 and Filing No. 28 , are denied. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Reimers v. JBS USA, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBS USA, LLC
Represented By: Aaron A. Clark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn K. Reimers
Represented By: Thomas A. Wagoner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]