Sneed v. Social Security Administration

Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Brenda Lee Sneed
Defendant: Social Security Administration
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00050
Filed: February 13, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER The Commissioner's motion to strike (filing 32 ) is denied as moot. This case is reversed and remanded to the Commissioner for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
February 14, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (filing 2 ) is granted, and the complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. The Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this memorandum and order together wi th three summons forms and three copies of Form 285 to plaintiff for service of process on the United States. Plaintiff shall, as soon as possible, complete the forms (see attached Notice for persons to be served) and send the completed summonses and USM-285 forms back to the Clerk of the court. In the absence of those forms, service of process cannot occur. Upon receipt of the completed summons forms and USM-285 forms, the Clerk shall sign the summonses and forward them, together with copies of the complaint, to the U.S. Marshal for service on the United States. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed with forms to pro se party) (AOA)
July 15, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff shall have until August 15, 2013, to complete service of process or to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for her failure to effect service of process. If plaintiff does not respond, or if good cause is not shown, this action will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline with the following text: August 15, 2013: deadline for plaintiff to show cause why service of process was not completed. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sneed v. Social Security Administration
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Lee Sneed
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]