Smith v. Anderson et al

Defendant: Maggie Loza, Angie Anderson, Heather Andrus, Hanna Baskerville, Tan Payton and Rebecca Salinas
Plaintiff: Deborah Ann Smith
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00054
Filed: February 15, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2013 14 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the plaintiff shall have until January 10, 2014 to show cause why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) or for want of prosecution. The failure to timely comply with this order may result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB, )
February 12, 2014 16 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Magistrate Judge's 15 Findings and Recommendation are adopted. This case is dismissed. A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (ADB)
March 25, 2013 6 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER provisionally granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
July 31, 2013 7 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's ERISA claims against Baskerville and Andrus may proceed and service is now warranted. All other claims against all other Defendants are dismissed without prejudice to reassertion in an amended complaint. To obtain service of process on Baskerville and Andrus, Plaintiff must complete and return the summons forms which the Clerk of the court will provide. The Clerk of the court shall send TWO summons forms and TWO USM-285 forms to Plaintiff together with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Plaintiff shall, as soon as possible, complete the forms and send the completed forms back to the Clerk of the court. In the absence of the forms, service of process cannot occur. Upon receipt of the completed forms, the Clerk of the court will sign the summons forms, to be forwarded with a copy of the Complaint, to the U.S. Marshal for service of process. The Marshal shall serve the summonses and Complaint without payment of costs or fees. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: "November 25, 2013: Check for completion of service of summons." Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel (Filing No. 3 ) is denied wi thout prejudice to reassertion. CM/ECF pages 3 and 4 of Filing Number 1 are in reverse order. The Clerk of the court is directed to strike Filing Number 1 from the record and replace it with a filing with the corrected order of pages. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Smith v. Anderson et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maggie Loza
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angie Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Andrus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanna Baskerville
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tan Payton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Salinas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Ann Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]