Rico v. JBS USA, LLC

Plaintiff: Maria Rico
Defendant: JBS USA, LLC
Case Number: 8:2013cv00058
Filed: February 21, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Jon Rehm's 14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and for attorney lien is held in abeyance. The plaintiff shall have to on or before November 4, 2013, to respond to the motion to withdraw and for an attorney lien by filing a brief wi th the Clerk of Court. If no response is received or if substitute counsel has entered an appearance by that date, the motion to withdraw will be granted. If the motion to withdraw is granted and substitute counsel has not entered an appearance, t he plaintiff will be considered proceeding pro se. Moving counsel shall serve a copy of his motion and this order on his client and file a certificate of such service with the court, including the plaintiff's last known address. The plaintiff's time to respond to the defendant's 13 Motion to Compel and all other deadlines are stayed pending resolution of Mr. Rehm's motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB)
November 14, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Jon Rehm's 14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and for an attorney lien is held in abeyance. The plaintiff shall have to on or before December 16, 2013, to respond to the motion to withdraw and for an attorney lien by filing a b rief with the Clerk of Court. On or before November 19, 2013, Mr. Rehm shall serve a copy of his motion, the October 4, 2013, Order, and this order on his client and file a certificate of such service with the court, including the plaintiff's last known address. Failure to comply with this order may result in denial of counsel's motion to withdraw and other sanctions against counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB)
December 17, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Jon Rehm's motion to withdraw as counsel is granted. The plaintiff is considered proceeding pro se and counsel for the defendant may communicate with her directly. Jon Rehm's motion for an attorney lien is denied. On or before January 17, 2013, the plaintiff shall file a response to the defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery 13 . The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this order and the defendant's Motion to Compel 13 , with attachments, to the plaintiff at: Maria Rico, 617 W. 13th Street, Grand Island, NE 68801. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copies mailed as directed) (JSF)
January 21, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion to Compel. The plaintiff shall have to on or before February 21, 2014, in which to produce initial disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1), and respond to the defendant's Interrogatories, with out objections, and Request for Production, and to file certification of the production pursuant to NECivR 26.1, 33.1, and 34.1. The plaintiff shall have to on or before February 21, 2014, to show cause why the defendant should not be awarded reasona ble costs and attorneys fees incurred in bringing this motion to compel, in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a), including involuntary dismissal of the plaintiff's claims. In the alternative to participating in discovery, the plaintiff may, as appears consistent with her instructions to her former attorney, notify the Clerk of Court in writing of her intention to voluntarily withdraw the lawsuit. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
April 28, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER adopting 25 the Findings and Recommendation of the magistrate judge; and the defendant's Motions for Sanctions and Expenses 23 is granted in part and denied in part as set forth in the F&R. The plaintiff's complain t is dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 and NECivR 41.2. The defendant's motion is denied in all other respects subject to the condition the plaintiff must pay the attorney fees and costs reasonably incurred by the defendant related to discovery before the plaintiff is allowed to continue this lawsuit or pursue a new lawsuit against the defendant. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (JSF) Modified on 4/28/2014 to indicate copy mailed to pro se party (JSF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rico v. JBS USA, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Rico
Represented By: Jonathan V. Rehm
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBS USA, LLC
Represented By: Aaron A. Clark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]