Mendoza v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al

Defendant: Jeff Davis, John Does, #1-5, John Does, #6-10 and United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Plaintiff: Ramon Mendoza and Laura Mendoza
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00065
Filed: February 28, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 3, 2013 44 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- The plaintiffs' motion to amend their complaint, Filing No. 39 , is granted. The plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint on or before September 18, 2013. ICE's motion to dismiss the original complaint, Filing N o. 16 , is denied as moot. The magistrate judge's findings of law and fact, Filing No. 28 , are adopted in their entirety. The plaintiffs' objection to the magistrate judge's order to stay discovery, Filing No. 33 , is overruled, pending ICEs filing a renewed motion to dismiss.. Davis's objection to a portion of the relief sought, Filing No. 30 , is overruled for the reasons set forth herein. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (MKR)
October 15, 2013 55 Featured Case ORDER denying U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement's motion to strike and granting 53 the plaintiff's motion to authorize discovery to the extent discovery is allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
July 31, 2014 91 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendants Jeff Davis's and Sarpy County's motion for leave to amend their answer (Filing No. 86 ) is denied. Defendants Jeff Davis's and Sarpy County's motion to dismiss (Filing No. 87 ) is denied. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (MKR)
July 31, 2014 92 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The plaintiff's motion to defer ruling (Filing No. 73 ) is granted with respect to the motion for summary judgment and denied with respect to the motion to dismiss. Defendant Osterberg's motion to strike (Filing N o. 82 ) is denied as moot. Defendant Osterberg's motion for summary judgment (Filing No. 60 ) is denied as premature, without prejudice to refiling. Defendant Osterberg's motion to dismiss (Filing No. 60 ) is denied. The parties sha ll have twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order in which to file a planning report with the court pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (MKR) Modified on 7/31/2014 to include planning report information (MKR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mendoza v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Davis
Represented By: Vincent Valentino
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does, #1-5
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does, #6-10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Mendoza
Represented By: Denise E. Frost
Represented By: Amy A. Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Mendoza
Represented By: Amy A. Miller
Represented By: Denise E. Frost
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]