Sikora v. National Indemnity Company, et al

Defendant: Karen Rainwater, Janelle Kay and National Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Nicholus B. Sikora
Case Number: 8:2013cv00068
Filed: March 1, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601 Family Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the plaintiff's motion to stay this case for 60 days while the plaintiff retains new counsel 14 is denied. The court will enter a progression order based on the parties' Rule 26(f) Report, (Filing No.17), but without prejudice to re-examination of those deadlines upon the motion of Plaintiff's new counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB)
September 10, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER approving 37 Stipulation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB)
September 25, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part 34 Motion to Compel; denying as moot 41 Motion for Hearing. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB)
October 4, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the order of the magistrate judge 49 is affirmed and plaintiff's 50 Statement of Objection is overruled. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
October 10, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 Stipulation for Dismissal. This action is dismissed with prejudice, without payment by any of the defendants to plaintiff, with each party to pay their own fees and costs. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sikora v. National Indemnity Company, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Rainwater
Represented By: Mary K. O'Connor
Represented By: Tara A. Stingley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janelle Kay
Represented By: Tara A. Stingley
Represented By: Mary K. O'Connor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Indemnity Company
Represented By: Mary K. O'Connor
Represented By: Tara A. Stingley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholus B. Sikora
Represented By: Luke F. Vavricek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]