Al-Turk v. University of Nebraska et al

Defendant: John Lenich, University of Nebraska, Craig R. Lawson, Board of Regents of the University of Nebraska, Susan Poser, University of Nebraska College of Law and Brian Lepard
Plaintiff: Layth Mohammad Al-Turk
Case Number: 8:2013cv00074
Filed: March 5, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Zwart for expedited progression. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JSF)
April 5, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding pending motions: 1) Plaintiff's motion for recusal, (Filing No. 31 ), is denied.2) Defendants' motion to transfer the trial location to Lincoln, (Filing No. 22 ), is granted, and the plaintiff's objection to that motion, (Filing No. 29 ), is denied.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
April 8, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Judge Kopf recuses himself from this case and the Clerk shall refer this matter to the Chief Judge for reassignment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JSF)
April 18, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the planning conference scheduled for April 18, 2013, is cancelled. The parties shall have until May 1, 2013, to submit settlement papers to the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
April 26, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Stipulation for Dismissal. This matter is hereby dismissed with prejudice to the filing of a new action, and each party is responsible for their own costs incurred. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Al-Turk v. University of Nebraska et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Lenich
Represented By: David R. Buntain
Represented By: John C. Wiltse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Nebraska
Represented By: David R. Buntain
Represented By: John C. Wiltse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig R. Lawson
Represented By: David R. Buntain
Represented By: John C. Wiltse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Regents of the University of Nebraska
Represented By: John C. Wiltse
Represented By: David R. Buntain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Poser
Represented By: David R. Buntain
Represented By: John C. Wiltse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Nebraska College of Law
Represented By: David R. Buntain
Represented By: John C. Wiltse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Lepard
Represented By: David R. Buntain
Represented By: John C. Wiltse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Layth Mohammad Al-Turk
Represented By: Frederick D. Stehlik
Represented By: Robert A. Mooney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]