Nesbitt v. Houston

Respondent: Robert Houston
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Petitioner: Thomas Edward Nesbitt
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00075
Filed: March 5, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2013 14 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying the Petitioner's 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
October 31, 2013 15 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Nesbitt's Motion for Recusal (filing no. 7 ) is denied. Respondent's Motion to Dismiss (filing no. 8 ) is granted. Nesbitt's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing no. 1 ) is dismissed without prejudi ce to the reassertion of a subsequent petition upon authorization by the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. The court will not issue a certificate of appealability in this matter. Nesbitt's Motion for Hearing (filing no. 10 ), Motion for Records (filing no. 11 ), and Motion for Copies (filing no. 13 ) are denied. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this memorandum and order. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
March 25, 2013 4 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (filing no. 2 ) is provisionally granted and Petitioner will not be required to pay the $5.00 fee at this time. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(AOA)
May 14, 2013 5 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -Upon initial review of the Petition (Filing No. 1 ), the court preliminarily decides that Petitioners claims are potentially cognizable in federal court; The Clerk of the court is directed to mail copies of this Memorandum a nd Order and the Petition (Filing No. 1 ) to Respondents and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail; By June 27, 2013, Respondent shall file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: July 26, 2013: check for Respondent to file answer and separate brief. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 6/27/2013: deadline for Respondent to file state courtrecords in support of answer or motion for summary judgment.) Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copies mailed as directed)(MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Nesbitt v. Houston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Houston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Jon C. Bruning
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas Edward Nesbitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]