Green et al v. Intersecurities, Inc.

Plaintiff: Daniel P. Roeder, Charlotte Green and Don Green
Defendant: Intersecurities, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2013cv00076
Filed: March 5, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1441 - Petition for Removal: SEC Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the Plaintiff's 18 Motion for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs shall file their Second Amended Complaint by or before September 13, 2013. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by or before September 27, 2013. Second Amended Complaint due by 9/13/2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (MKR)
November 12, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (MKR)
July 14, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 49 Joint Motion to Amend. Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2015 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 2/17/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
October 7, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL- The Parties' Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice (Filing No. 51 ) is approved; All claims asserted in the above-captioned matter should be dismissed with prejudice; and The parties will bear their own costs and attorney's fees. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green et al v. Intersecurities, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel P. Roeder
Represented By: John L. Spray
Represented By: Kelly R. Hoffschneider
Represented By: David M. Gaba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Green
Represented By: John L. Spray
Represented By: Kelly R. Hoffschneider
Represented By: David M. Gaba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Green
Represented By: John L. Spray
Represented By: Kelly R. Hoffschneider
Represented By: David M. Gaba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intersecurities, Inc.
Represented By: Alison Gutierrez
Represented By: Patrick B. Griffin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]