Brown v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Albert Burgess Brown, Jr.
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00080
Filed: March 6, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2013 13 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Commissioner's motion to dismiss (Filing No. 5 ) is denied without prejudice. Mr. Brown's objections (Filing Nos. 7 , 8 , 10 , and 12 ) are denied. Mr. Browns motion to enter (Filing No. 11) is denied as moot. Since the Commissioner has conceded that the Social Security Administration has been properly served (Filing No. 9 , at 1), no further proof of service of process will be required as to the agency only. Mr. Brown will provide to the Court proof of service of process upon the United States (the United States Attorney for the District of Nebraska and the Attorney General of the United States) by following the four-step procedure delineated above, on or before August 1, 2013. Thereafter, the clerk of the court is ordered to set the answer deadline for the Commissioner. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (AOA)
July 10, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 14 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend. Inasmuch as the summonses in question have been returned executed, the Court finds that the motion should be denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
September 16, 2013 25 Featured Case ORDER - Defendant's request is granted. "Carolyn W. Colvin, Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration" shall be substituted as the proper defendant in this action. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (AOA)
September 25, 2013 29 Featured Case ORDER - Plaintiff's objection to the scheduling order is denied. Plaintiff shall have until November 1, 2013, to file his brief in support of his position. Defendant shall have until December 2, 2013, to file a brief in response thereto. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(AOA)
December 2, 2013 39 Featured Case ORDER - Defendant's motion is granted. Defendant shall have until December 16, 2013, to respond to plaintiff's brief. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(AOA)
January 16, 2014 46 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION - The Court will affirm the denial of benefits and will deny all pending motions. A separate order will be entered in accordance with this memorandum opinion. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brown v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Burgess Brown, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]