Coleman v. Correct Care Solutions

Defendant: Brenda Tacke and Valarie Jass
Plaintiff: Ruth C. Coleman
Case Number: 8:2013cv00082
Filed: March 12, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice. See Stewart v. Ragon, 447 Fed.Appx. 756 (8th Cir. 2012) (affirming district courts pre-service dismissal, with prejudice, where Plaintiff fa iled to show cause why matter should not be dismissed for failure to file suit within 90 days of receipt of right-to-sue letter from EEOC). A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
January 6, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: On the court's own motion, Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. The Clerk of the court shall provide the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
August 28, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: To obtain service of process on Defendant, Plaintiff must complete and return the summons form that the Clerk of the Court will provide. The Clerk of the Court shall send one summons form and o ne USM-285 form to Plaintiff, together with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Plaintiff shall, as soon as possible, complete the forms and send the completed forms back to the Clerk of the Court. Upon receipt of the completed forms, the Clerk of the Court will sign the summons forms, to be forwarded with a copy of the Complaint (Filing No. 1 ), Amended Complaint (Filing No. 7 ), and Response (Filing No. 9 ) to the U.S. Marshal for service of process. The Marshal shall serve the summon s and the Complaint and Amended Complaint without payment of costs or fees. Service may be by certified mail pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4 and Nebraska law in the discretion of the Marshal. The Clerk of the Court will copy the Compl aint and Amended Complaint, and Plaintiff does not need to do so. Plaintiff is hereby notified that failure to obtain service of process on a defendant within 120 days of the date of this order may result in dismissal of this matter without furthe r notice as to such defendant. A defendant has 21 days after receipt of the summons to answer or otherwise respond to a complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: &qu ot;December 29, 2014: Check for completion of service of summons." The parties are bound by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and by the Local Rules of this court. Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of her current address at all times while this case is pending. Failure to do so may result in dismissal. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
April 8, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis is provisionally granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
August 8, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order to file an amended complaint in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. If Plaintiff fails to do so, this matter will be dismissed without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline using the following text: September 6, 2013: Check for amended complaint. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
October 11, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff will be given 20 days to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for her failure to file suit within 90 days of her receipt of a right-to-sue notice. In order for this matter t o proceed, Plaintiff must show either that she filed suit within 90 days of receipt of a right-to-sue notice, or that equitable or exceptional circumstances exist that warrant tolling of the 90-day period. The court directs the Clerk of the court to set the following pro se case management deadline in this matter: October 29, 2013: Deadline for Plaintiff to show cause. The court reserves the right to conduct further review of Plaintiff's claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2) after Plaintiff addresses the matters set forth in this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Correct Care Solutions
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Tacke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valarie Jass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth C. Coleman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]