American Tile and Marble Co. v. All Granite & Marble Corp.

Defendant: All Granite & Marble Corp.
Plaintiff: American Tile and Marble Co.
Case Number: 8:2013cv00089
Filed: March 18, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed Question: Fed Communications Act of 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Counsel shall file a joint status report concerning the status of this case on January 28, 2015, and every six months thereafter, such report shall include counsel's position(s) concerning whether the stay should conti nue in effect or whether the stay should be lifted. The plaintiff's Amended Motion for Class Certification (Filing No. 47 ) is held in abeyance pending a motion by either party to establish a briefing schedule. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the plaintiffs Amended Motion for Class Certification (Filing No. 47 ) for statistical purposes. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
January 6, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that upon notice of settlement (Filing No. 52) given to the magistrate judge on January 5, 2015, by Burke Smith, attorney for the plaintiff, IT IS ORDERED that: On or before February 6, 2015, the parties shall electronically file a joint sti pulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to the Honorable Joseph F. Bataillon, at bataillon@ned.uscourts.gov, a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB)
February 23, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 56 Stipulation for Dismissal. This case is dismissed with prejudice, as regards Plaintiff American Tile & Marble Co., each party to bear its own costs. This case is dismissed without prejudice with regard to the members of the putative, uncertified, class. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Tile and Marble Co. v. All Granite & Marble Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Granite & Marble Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Tile and Marble Co.
Represented By: Alexander H. Burke
Represented By: Burke Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]