Nitsch v. Commissioner of Social Security

Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Jessica M Nitsch
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00095
Filed: March 20, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:1383 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER granting 16 Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Brief. The defendant shall have on or before September, 2013, in which to file and serve its answer brief; within one week after the defendant's answer b rief is filed, the plaintiff may file a reply brief and either party may request oral argument or make any other request which may be permitted under 42 U.S.C. § 405(g); and in the absence of an order setting the case for oral argument or scheduling further proceedings, the case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 3 hereof. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
August 20, 2013 18 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER regarding Order on Motion to Extend, 17 . The Defendants Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Brief, ECF No. 16, is granted; the defendant shall have on or before September 5, 2013, in which to file and serve its answer brief; within one week after the defendant's answer brief is filed, the plaintiff may file a reply brief and either party may request oral argument or make any other request which may be permitted under 42 U.S.C. § 405(g); and in the absence of an order setting the case for oral argument or scheduling further proceedings, the case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 3 hereof. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
September 9, 2013 20 Featured Case ORDER granting the Defendant's Second 19 Unopposed MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Brief 15 . The defendant shall have on or before October 7, 2013, in which to file and serve her response to the plaintiff's brief; within one week after the defendant's answer brief is filed, the plaintiff may file and serve a reply brief ; and The case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 3 hereof. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (MKR)
April 16, 2014 27 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ON REVIEW OF THE FINAL DECISION OF THE COMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY- The Commissioner of Social Security's decision is affirmed. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (MKR)
March 25, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER granting the Plaintiff's Application 2 for Leave to Proceed in District Court without prepaying fees or costs. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Nitsch v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica M Nitsch
Represented By: Mary P. Clarkson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]