Simmons v. Jarvis et al

Defendant: Jonathan B. Jarvis, Kenneth L. Salazar and United States of America
Plaintiff: Lee M. Simmons
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00098
Filed: March 25, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2013 21 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 20 Stipulation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB)
September 5, 2013 22 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER to Restrict Access and for Protective Order granting 19 Motion to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act and Motion for Entry of Protective Order 20 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB)
December 9, 2013 31 Featured Case ORDER - The parties disagree on subject matter jurisdiction on Count I and whether discovery can be allowed on Count II. Motions shall be filed as follows:Deadline for filing Plaintiff's motion to amend complaint is January 10, 2014.On or before January 17, 2014, the defendants shall file their motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or for failure to state a claim on Count I, their motion to dismiss for lack of standing, their motion to deny discovery, and any opposition to any motion to amend filed by the plaintiff. Plaintiff's brief in opposition to the defendants' motions to dismiss and motion to deny discovery shall be filed on or before February 14, 2014.Defendants' reply brief shall be filed on or before February 28, 2014. No discovery will be initiated until the Court rules on the defendants' motions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
August 26, 2014 48 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the deposition deadline is December 1, 2014. The parties' motions for summary judgment shall be filed on or before March 2, 2015, with any responses filed on or before April 2, 2015, and any replies filed on or before April 16, 2015. Any motion to permit disclosure of expert witnesses shall be filed on or before November 17, 2014. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JSF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Simmons v. Jarvis et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan B. Jarvis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth L. Salazar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee M. Simmons
Represented By: Bartholomew L. McLeay
Represented By: Brian C. Buescher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]