Schroer v. Baldwin Filters, Inc.

Defendant: Baldwin Filters, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lohn Schroer
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00101
Filed: March 27, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 11, 2013 27 Featured Case ORDER - Schroer's Statement of Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Filing No. 22 ) is overruled and denied. The Findings and Recommendation (Filing No. 16 ) is adopted as a final order. Schroer's Motion to Remand (Filing No. 9 ) is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (GJG)
July 29, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER - The defendant's Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, to Strike and for a More Definite Statement (Filing No. 7 ) is denied in part and granted in part. The defendants motion for a more definite statement is granted to the extent the plaintiff shall have until August 12, 2013, to file an amended complaint. The motion is denied in all other respects. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (GJG)
October 25, 2013 39 Featured Case ORDER - Baldwin's Motion to Dismiss, or, in the alternative, to Strike (Filing No. 34 ) is denied in part and granted in part. Schroer's fourth claim for wrongful termination based upon violation of public policy is dismissed. The motion is denied in all other respects. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Schroer v. Baldwin Filters, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baldwin Filters, Inc.
Represented By: Chad P. Richter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lohn Schroer
Represented By: Vikki S. Stamm
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]