Ornelas v. Houston et al

Defendant: Mike Kenney, Robert Houston, Margaret Antley, Nary Flearl, Frank Hopkins and Randy Kohl
Plaintiff: Francisco Ornelas
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00118
Filed: April 12, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 16, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Francisco Ornelas shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $21.94 by 5/16/13, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 5/16/2013: initial partial filing fee payment due. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party and institution as directed) (ADB, )
August 26, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Service 14 and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction 7 are denied. Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel 4 is taken under advisement. Plaintiff's Motion s for Status 13 and 15 are granted in part, and denied in part, in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. To obtain service of process on Defendants, Plaintiff must complete and return the summons forms which the Clerk of the court will provi de. The Clerk of the court shall send 7 summons forms and 7 USM-285 forms to Plaintiff together with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Upon receipt of the completed forms, the Clerk shall issue the summons. The Clerk of the Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: "December 20, 2013: Check for completion of service of summons." Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party with forms) (JSF)
March 18, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Houston, Hopkins, Kohl, and Kenny's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's official capacity claims 27 is denied. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's individual capacity claims 29 is denied. Plaintiff&# 039;s Motion to Appoint Counsel 4 is denied without prejudice to reassertion. In accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a)(4)(A), Defendants shall file their answer no later than 14 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order. A separate progression order will be entered progressing this matter to final disposition. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
June 24, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 32 Motion for Reconsideration. In accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a)(4)(A), Defendants shall file their answer no later than 14 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order. The clerk's office is directed to set the following pro se case management deadline: July 11, 2014: Check for answer from Defendants. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
July 2, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order to apprise the court of his current address, in the absence of which this matter will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 8/4/2014: deadline for information court of address) Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
August 13, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- This action is dismissed without prejudice, and a separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ornelas v. Houston et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Kenney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Houston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Antley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nary Flearl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Hopkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Kohl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Ornelas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]