Wilson et al v. Bruning et al

Defendant: Robert Madsen, Mario Peart, Frank Hopkins, Robert Houston, Jon Bruning, Dept of Corrections and State of Nebraska
Plaintiff: Gracy S. Sedlak and Harold B. Wilson
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00130
Filed: April 22, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Sedlak is directed to correct the above-listed technical defect in the Complaint within 30 days of the date of this Memorandum and Order. Accordingly, Sedlak must pay the $400.00 fees to the Clerk of the court, or submi t a request to proceed in forma pauperis and an affidavit of poverty in support thereof. Sedlak is reminded that Rule 11(a) requires that she sign every pleading, written motion, and other paper that she submits to the court, and that it is improp er for Plaintiff Harold Wilson to sign papers in place of, or to otherwise represent, her. (See court's orderfrom June 11, 2013 (Filing No. 9 ).) Failure to comply with this Memorandum and Order will result in dismissal of this matter as to Sed lak without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to send to Sedlak the Form AO240, Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: September 1, 2013: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party with form)(GJG)
August 13, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Harold Wilson shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $15.94 by September 12, 2013, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. The c lerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: September 13, 2013: initial partial filing fee payment due. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 9/13/2013. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed and to pro se party)(AOA)
August 13, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Leave to proceed in forma pauperis 14 isprovisionally granted, and the Complaint shall be filed as to Plaintiff Gracy Sedlak without payment of fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(AOA)
April 17, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiffs' First Amendment claim against Frank Hopkins in his individual and official capacities may proceed to service of process. All other claims against all other Defendants are dismissed. To obtain service of process on Defendant Frank Hopkins, Plaintiffs must complete and return the summons forms that the Clerk of the court will provide. The Clerk of the court shall send two summons forms and two USM-285 forms to Plaintiff, together with a c opy of this Memorandum and Order for service on Frank Hopkins in his individual and official capacities. Plaintiff shall, as soon as possible, complete the forms and send the completed forms back to the Clerk of the court. In the absence of the forms, service of process cannot occur. The Clerk of Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadlinein this case with the following text: "August 15, 2014: Check for completion ofservice of summons."Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party with summonses) (AOA)
July 15, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the clerk's office shall not process Plaintiff Gracy Sedlak's appeal. Plaintiff Gracy Sedlak may not proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. The clerk's office is directed to provide a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed) (JSF)
June 11, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiffs Wilson and Sedlak shall respond in accordance with this Memorandum and Order within 21 days of the date of this order. The clerk's office is directed to enter a case management deadline in this matter using th e following text: July 1, 2013: Deadline for plaintiffs to show cause. No further action shall be taken in this case until the court receives such responses. Failure to respond the courts order will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice and, as set forth above, may also result in the imposition of other sanctions. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)(AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wilson et al v. Bruning et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Madsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Peart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Hopkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Houston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Bruning
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept of Corrections
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nebraska
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gracy S. Sedlak
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold B. Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]