Birge v. Smeall et al

Defendant: Aaron E. Smeall and Smith, Gardner, Slusky, Lazer, Pohren & Rogers, LLP
Plaintiff: Lisa Birge
Case Number: 8:2013cv00136
Filed: April 25, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the defendant's 15 Motion for Extension of filing deadline. The parties shall have until July 11, 2013, to file their Rule26(f) planning report. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
July 17, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 8/28/2013 08:15 AM in Chambers before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
August 28, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER after a planning conference with the Court: All discovery is stayed pending ruling on the motion to dismiss. The motion for class certification shall be filed within seven days after the Court rules on the motion to dismiss, if that motion is not granted. All discovery on class action certification shall be completed by December 31, 2013. A hearing on class action status is scheduled for Tuesday, January 21, 2014 at 9 a.m. ( Status Conference set for 1/21/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom.) Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
October 10, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the plaintiff's 37 Motion for Extension of time. Plaintiff shall have until November 15, 2013, to respond to defendants' motion to reconsider. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
October 31, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER -Plaintiff's motion 41 is granted and her brief and index of evidence on class action certification shall be filed on or before January 10, 2014. Defendants' brief and index of evidence in opposition to class action certification shall be filed on or before January 31, 2014. A hearing on the class certification motion is scheduled for: Thursday, February 20, 2014, at 8:30 a.m.. Courtroom No. 5, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska. The dates for designation of experts will be established after the Courts ruling on class action certification. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
November 20, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the Plaintiff's 47 Motion to Strike filing 45 . Filing no. 46 is deemed to be the correct document. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
November 21, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Motion for Extension of filing deadline. Defendants shall have until December 9, 2013, to file their reply brief in support of their request to modify and for reconsideration. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
December 17, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION- A separate order will be entered in accordance with this memorandum opinion. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Birge v. Smeall et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron E. Smeall
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith, Gardner, Slusky, Lazer, Pohren & Rogers, LLP
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Birge
Represented By: William L. Reinbrecht
Represented By: Pamela A. Car
Represented By: O. Randolph Bragg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]