Cinch, LLC v. American Farmers And Ranchers Insurance Company et al

Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Great American Insurance Group and American Farmers and Ranchers Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Cinch, LLC
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00140
Filed: April 29, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: F.A. Gossett
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Travelers's Motion to Strike (filing 62 ) is denied. American's Motion to Exclude (filing 65 ) is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (AOA)
August 20, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 85 the Joint Motion to Extend. Pretrial Conference set for 12/22/2014 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 1/20/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
October 27, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court THIRD AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 87 Joint Motion to Extend. Pretrial Conference set for 1/22/2015 at 10:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 2/17/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cinch, LLC v. American Farmers And Ranchers Insurance Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut
Represented By: Thomas J. Culhane
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Group
Represented By: Mark J. Daly
Represented By: MaryBeth Frankman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Farmers and Ranchers Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael L. Moran
Represented By: Dan H. Ketcham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cinch, LLC
Represented By: David E. Copple
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]