Reaves v. Robitaille et al

Defendant: Jonathan Robitaille, Francis Gallo, Matt Chandler, Laurie Burgess and Unknown Law Enforcement Officers
Plaintiff: Danny D. Reaves
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00141
Filed: May 2, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's "Request for enlargement of time to serve defendants" (Filing No. 9 ) is denied. If the court determines that this matter may proceed to service of process, the court will extend the time in which Plaintiff has to serve Defendants. Plaintiff's Motion for Status (Filing No. 10 ) is granted to the extent it is consistent with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
September 24, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - For the reasons set forth above, Plaintiff's claims against Burgess are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order to file an amended complaint that clearly state s a plausible Fourth Amendment claim against Defendants. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint, or the court finds that the amended complaint is insufficient, this matter will be dismissed without further notice for failure to state a cl aim upon which relief may be granted. In the event that Plaintiff files an amended complaint, Plaintiff shall restate the allegations of the current Complaint and any new allegations. Failure to consolidate all claims into one document may result i n the abandonment of claims. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: October 21, 2013: Check for amended complaint. Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of his current address at all times while this case is pending. Failure to do so may result in dismissal without further notice. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
April 15, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. All pending Motions are denied. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (GJG)
June 11, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Danny D. Reaves shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $54.12 by 7/11/2013, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motio n. If the initial partial filing fee is not received by the specified deadline, this case will be dismissed. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 7/11/2013; initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff's "Motion to Supplement In Fo rma Pauperis Request" (Filing No. 7 ) is granted. The court considered the supplemental information in determining Plaintiff's initial partial filing fee. Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of his current address at all times, and all parties are bound by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and by the court's Local Rules while this case is pending. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party and to plaintiff's institution)(GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Reaves v. Robitaille et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Robitaille
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Gallo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Chandler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie Burgess
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Law Enforcement Officers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny D. Reaves
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]