Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Lundstrom et al

Defendant: Ann Lindley Spence, Campbell R. McConnell, Gilbert G. Lundstrom, James A. Laphen, Randall B. Kidd, Charles W. Hoskins, David L. Hartman and Delmar E. Williams
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00168
Filed: May 31, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
 
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2014 103 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to the parties' stipulations 101 and 102 , the Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendants' MOTIONS to Dismiss 46 and 44 is extended to February 20, 2014. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MKR)
August 29, 2013 60 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to the parties' stipulations 58 and 59 , Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendants' motions to dismiss 44 and 46 is extended to September 19, 2013. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (ADB)
September 3, 2013 62 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 61 Stipulation. FDIC-R's deadline for filing a motion to strike defendant Laphen's original answer is extended to September 19, 2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB)
September 17, 2013 65 Featured Case ORDER, pursuant to the parties' 63 Stipulation and 64 Stipulation, that Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendants' motions to dismiss (filings 44 and 46 ) is extended to October 3, 2013. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (ADB)
October 3, 2013 74 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to the parties' 71 Stipulation and 72 Stipulation, Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendants' motions to dismiss 44 and 46 is extended to October 24, 2013. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (ADB)
October 24, 2013 78 Featured Case ORDER that pursuant to the parties' stipulations (filings 75 Stipulation; 76 Stipulation; 77 Stipulation), Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendants' motions to dismiss (filings 44, 46) is extended to November 14, 2013. Plaintiff's deadline to file a motion to strike Defendant Laphen's answer (filing 55) is extended to November 15, 2013. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (ADB, )
November 18, 2013 85 Featured Case ORDER that pursuant to the parties' Stipulations 83 and 84 , Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendants' motions to dismiss 44 and 46 is extended to December 5, 2013. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JSF)
November 18, 2013 86 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the pretrial proceedings in Case Nos. 8:13CV168 and 4:12CV3148 are consolidated. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JSF)
December 6, 2013 89 Featured Case ORDER granting Stipulations 87 and 88 . Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendants' motions to dismiss (filings 44, 46) is extended to December 30, 2013. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (ADB)
January 6, 2014 96 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to the parties' 94 and 95 Stipulations, that Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendants' motions to dismiss (filings 44 , 46 ) is extended to January 20, 2014. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Lundstrom et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Lindley Spence
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell R. McConnell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert G. Lundstrom
Represented By: Minja Herian
Represented By: Gregory C. Scaglione
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Laphen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall B. Kidd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles W. Hoskins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Hartman
Represented By: Minja Herian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delmar E. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: James J. Niemeier
Represented By: David Mullin
Represented By: James J. Frost
Represented By: Mark F. Enenbach
Represented By: Richard Biggs
Represented By: Robert R. Bell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]