Lo Grande v. Douglas County Correction Center et al

Defendant: Dr. Morin, Douglas County Correction Center and Lisa Unknown
Plaintiff: Charles J. Lo Grande
HSA: Tammy Barsovsly
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00181
Filed: June 17, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff shall have until September 30, 2013, to apprise the court of his current address, in the absence of which this matter will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: September 30, 2013: deadline for informing court of address. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
October 24, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This action is dismissed without prejudice, and a separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
July 31, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Charles J. Lo Grande shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $14.00 by 9/1/2013, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written m otion. If the initial partial filing fee is not received by the specified deadline, this case will be dismissed. The clerks office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiffs institution. The clerk's off ice is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: September 1, 2013: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of his current address at all times, and all parties are bound by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and by the court's Local Rules while this case is pending. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party and institution as directed)(GJG)
August 19, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to waive his filing fee (Filing No. 8 ) is denied. On the court's own motion, Plaintiff is granted a 30-day extension of time in which to pay his $14.00 initial partial filing fee. Accordin gly, Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $14.00 by October 1, 2013. If the initial partial filing fee is not received by this date, Plaintiff's case will be dismissed. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: October 1, 2013: initial partial filing fee payment due. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lo Grande v. Douglas County Correction Center et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Morin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County Correction Center
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Unknown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles J. Lo Grande
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Hsa: Tammy Barsovsly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]