Richter v. United States Postal Service

Defendant: United States Postal Service
Plaintiff: Ruth Richter
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00212
Filed: July 11, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Non-Motor Vehic
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Defendant shall provide Plaintiff with copies of future filings it makes in this action by mailing copies of such filings to Plaintiff at the following address: 5644 Leavenworth Street, Omaha, NE 68106. This is the address Plaintiff has pro vided to the Court. Plaintiff shall promptly notify the Court and Defendant if her address changes. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff at the above-referenced address. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (Copies mailed as directed) (AOA)
October 25, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Filing No. 33 ) is denied, without prejudice to reassertion after the court authorizes the parties to initiate discovery. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
November 14, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's motion to transfer or remand, Filing No. 13 , is denied. Plaintiff's motion to strike, Filing No. 14 , is denied. The magistrate judge's F&R, Filing No. 19 , is adopte d in its entirety. Plaintiff's objections, Filing No. 28 , to the F&R are overruled. Defendant's motion to dismiss, Filing No. 25 , is granted. The plaintiff's objection, Filing No. 40 , to the magistrate judge's order, Filing No. 39 , regarding plaintiff's motion to compel, is denied as moot. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
November 21, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration, Filing No. 43 , is denied. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
November 27, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion for New Reconsideration, Filing No. 45 , is denied. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Richter v. United States Postal Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Represented By: Lynnett M. Wagner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Richter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]