United States of America v. $116,550.00 in United States Currency

Defendant: $116,550.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Case Number: 8:2013cv00294
Filed: September 19, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that after conferring with the parties, the discovery and deposition deadline is extended to 6/17/14. A telephonic Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 8/4/2014 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. The Jury Trial of this case is set to commence before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf in the Special Proceedings Courtroom, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE on 8/18/2014 at 9:00 AM. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JSF)
August 4, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Jury Trial is continued to 11/3/2014 at 9:00 AM in the Special Proceedings Courtroom, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. The Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 10/27/2014 at 9:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JSF)
October 22, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Oral Motion to Continue. The Evidentiary Hearing is reset for 11/13/2014 10:00 AM Courtroom 1 (Special Proceedings), Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plz, Omaha, NE before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Non-Jury Trial set for 1/12/2015 at 09:00 AM Courtroom 1 (Special Proceedings), Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plz, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. Pretrial Conference is reset for 12/30/2014 at 10:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
February 9, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court DECREE of Forfeiture. The Plaintiff's Motion for Decree of Forfeiture 36 is hereby sustained. All right, title and interest in or to the Defendant currency held by any person or entity is hereby forever barred and foreclosed. The Defendant cu rrency shall be and the same hereby is forfeited to the United States of America. The Defendant currency shall be disposed of by the United States of America in accordance with law. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (1 Certified copy to USM) (JSF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $116,550.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $116,550.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nancy A. Svoboda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.