Shanghai Foretex Fashion Co., Ltd. v. Wes and Willy, LLC

Plaintiff: Shanghai Foretex Fashion Co., Ltd.
Defendant: Wes and Willy, LLC
Case Number: 8:2014cv00106
Filed: April 2, 2014
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying as moot Defendant Wes and Willy, L.L.C.'s 28 Motion to Extend Deadline and 29 Motion for Leave to file its response instanter. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
July 29, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying Plaintiff's 38 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's motion to file a Second Amended Complaint, (Filing No. 24 ), is granted. The plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint shall be filed on or before August 1, 2014, and promptly served on defendant William J. Mullen.( Amended Complaint due by 8/1/2014). As to all parties, before moving for an order relating to discovery, the movant must first request a conference with the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
August 26, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the parties' 53 Stipulation. The deadlines within the final progression order 18 , are extended as follows: The deadline for completing written discovery under Rules 33 through 36 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is December 1, 2014. The deadlines for identifying expert witnesses expected to testify at trial are: For the plaintiff: September 15, 2014. For the defendants: October 15, 2014. The deadlines to complete expert disclosures (both retained experts (Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(B)) and non-retained experts (Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) (C)) are: For the plaintiff: December 1, 2014. For the defendant: January 2, 2015. The deposition deadline is January 30, 2015. The deadline for filing motions to dismiss, motions for summary judgment, and motions to exclude testimony on Daubert and related grounds is February 15, 2015. However, if any such motions are filed after December 10, 2014, the pretrial conference and trial may be continued on the courts own motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
December 8, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -1) The parties' stipulation to extend deadlines, (Filing No. 62 ), is granted, and the plaintiff's motion for leave to file plaintiff's expert witness reports out of time, (Filing No. 61 ), is therefore denied as moot.2) The final progression order is amended as stated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
December 23, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The case progression schedule is stayed pending further order of the court. A telephonic conference with the undersigned magistrate judge will be held on February 25, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. to discuss the current status of the parties settle ment efforts or to set a new progression schedule for trial. Counsel for plaintiff shall place the call. This call will be cancelled and a deadline will be set for filing dismissal documents if, prior to the call, the parties advise my chambers b y telephone ((402) 437-1670) or by email (zwart@ned.uscourts.gov) that the parties' have fully settled the case.( Telephone Conference set for 2/25/2015 at 09:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
February 9, 2015 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion to Seal. 1) Filing No. 70, Filing No. 71, and Filing No. 71-3 as redacted by the court(see attached), shall be filed on the public docket.2) Filing No. 71-1 shall be filed as a restricted access document.3) Filing No. 71-2 shall remain filed under seal. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
February 23, 2015 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 70 motion to withdraw. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)(NEF re-generated by CRZ after unsealing)
March 30, 2015 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The court has been advised that the parties in this case have settled their claims. Accordingly, On or before April 30, 2015, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal, or other dispositive stipulation, together with submitt ing to the undersigned judge a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. This case is removed from the Courts trial docket. The Clerk of the Court shall set a dismissal papers deadline of April 30, 2015. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shanghai Foretex Fashion Co., Ltd. v. Wes and Willy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanghai Foretex Fashion Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Steven E. Achelpohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wes and Willy, LLC
Represented By: James J. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.