Picus v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al Featured Case

Defendant: Del Monte Foods Company, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Sunshine Mills, Inc., Menu Foods Inc. and Chemnutra, Inc.
Plaintiff: Margaret Picus
 
Case Number: 2:2007cv00689
Filed: May 25, 2007
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Roger L. Hunt
Referring Judge: Robert J. Johnston
 
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl Petition for Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2007 10 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER to Consolidate. It is Ordered that 2:07-CV-00686-RLH-RJJ and 2:07-CV-00689-RLH-RJJ are consolidated under 2:07-CV-00682-PMP-LRL. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 6/21/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AAB)
July 17, 2007 11
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel submitted by attorney Steven L. Rodriguez, (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 617732) by Defendant Del Monte Foods Company. (Salerno, Nicholas)
July 17, 2007 12
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel submitted by attorney John Joseph McDonough, (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 617771) by Defendant Del Monte Foods Company. (Salerno, Nicholas)
July 17, 2007 13
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel submitted by attorney Richard Fama, (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 617782) by Defendant Del Monte Foods Company. (Salerno, Nicholas)
July 19, 2007 14
REPLY to Response to filed by Defendant Del Monte Foods Company. (Salerno, Nicholas)
July 20, 2007 16 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER Granting 11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven L. Rodriquez for Del Monte Foods Company and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 7/20/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
July 20, 2007 17 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 12 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John Joseph McDonough for Del Monte Foods Company and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 7/20/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
July 20, 2007 18 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER Granting 13 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard Fama for Del Monte Foods Company and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 7/20/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
September 13, 2007 19
REPLY to Response to filed by Defendant Del Monte Foods Company. Motion to Stay Proceedings (Salerno, Nicholas)
May 25, 2007 1
PETITION FOR REMOVAL by Del Monte Foods Company from State Court of Nevada, Case Number A540315, (Filing fee $ 350), filed by Del Monte Foods Company. (Attachments: # 1)(AXM)
May 25, 2007 2
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Defendant Del Monte Foods Company. (AXM)
February 1, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Stipulation of Dismissal for actions with prejudice. (Case No. 2:07-cv-00682-PMP-LRL, consolidated with Case No. 2:07-cv-00689-PMP-LRL and Case No. 2:07-cv-00686-PMP-LRL) be dismissed in its entirety with prejudice. Case terminated. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 2/1/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
May 29, 2007 4
NOTE: In accordance with 28:636(c), counsel in the instant action are provided with a copy of the "AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form. Upon consent by all parties, counsel are advised to manually file this form with the Clerk's Office. (MJZ)
June 6, 2007 5
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Certificate of Service by Defendant Del Monte Foods Company. Service of May 29, 2007 Minute Order of the Honorable Roger L. Hung, U.S. District Court Judge. (Grossman, Dawn)
June 6, 2007 6
STATEMENT RE: REMOVAL IN RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S MAY 29, 2007 MINUTE ORDER filed by Defendant Del Monte Foods Company. (Grossman, Dawn)
June 6, 2007 7
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Defendant Del Monte Foods Company's Statement Re: Removal in Response to the Court's May 29, 2007 Minute Order by Defendant Del Monte Foods Company re 6 Statement in Removal Case. (Grossman, Dawn)
June 8, 2007 8
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court by Defendant Del Monte Foods Company. (Grossman, Dawn)
June 8, 2007 9
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court by Defendant Del Monte Foods Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment to Certificate of Service# 2 Exhibit Attachment to Certificate of Service)(Grossman, Dawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Picus v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Monte Foods Company
Represented By: Dawn Grossman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunshine Mills, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemnutra, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas M Wieczorek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Picus
Represented By: Robert B. Gerard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]