Secalt S.A. et al v. Wuxi Shenxi Construction Machinery Company, Ltd.

Plaintiff: Secalt S.A. and Tractel, Inc.
Defendant: Wuxi Shenxi Construction Machinery Company, Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2008cv00336
Filed: March 14, 2008
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Referring Judge: George W Foley
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2010 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Motions to Seal 129 , 144 , 150 , 152 , 158 , and 165 are GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/21/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
August 17, 2010 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment 127 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 145 and Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Dr. Cagan 154 , are DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/17/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
December 21, 2010 203 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiff Seacalt S.A. et al.s objections to the bill of costs and request for the court to strike certain fees 190 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendant Wuxi Shenxi Construction Machine Company, Ltd. to file an amended bill of costs. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/21/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
December 23, 2010 204 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that defendant Wuxi Shenxi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd.s motion for attorney fees in the amount of $836,899.99 184 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/23/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
December 23, 2010 205 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Wuxi Shenxi Construction Machinery Company, Ltd. against Secalt S.A., Tractel, Inc.. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 12/23/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Secalt S.A. et al v. Wuxi Shenxi Construction Machinery Company, Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Secalt S.A.
Represented By: Paul Swenson Prior
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tractel, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Swenson Prior
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wuxi Shenxi Construction Machinery Company, Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]