Parball Corporation v. Kakavas

Plaintiff: Parball Corporation
Defendant: Harry Kakavas
Case Number: 2:2008cv00718
Filed: June 3, 2008
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Negotiable Instrument Office
County: Clark
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Referring Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 25 parties' Stipulation for Defendant to file and serve a response to 1 Complaint. ( Responses due by 5/11/2009.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/31/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
May 29, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 28 parties' Stipulation to stay action until 06/16/2009 for the parties to attempt to finalize their settlement and document same. The parties agree that plaintiff's response to 27 defendant's MOTION to Dismiss First Claim for Relief Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) shall be due on 06/17/2009 in the event the parties are unable to finalize the settlement and to file an appropriate document herein in the interim. ( Responses due by 6/17/2009.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/29/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
June 18, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 30 parties' Stipulation to continue the stay until 06/30/2009 to finalize the settlement documents. The parties agree that plaintiff's response to defendant's 27 motion to dismiss shall be due on 07/01/2009 in the event the parties are unable to finalize the settlement. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/17/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
July 2, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 32 parties' Stipulation to stay this action until 07/15/2009, to enable the parties to finalize settlement. In the event the parties are not able to finalize the settlement, plaintiff's response to 27 MOTION to Dismiss First Claim for Relief Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) is due on 0716/2009. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/2/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parball Corporation v. Kakavas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parball Corporation
Represented By: David C. Nelson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Kakavas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]