Lucas et al v. Bell Trans

Plaintiff: Anthony Lucas, Gregory Castello, Lillian Melton, Leavon Smith and Robert Greene
Defendant: Bell Trans
Case Number: 2:2008cv01792
Filed: December 18, 2008
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Labor: Fair Standards Office
County: Clark
Referring Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:2(a) Fair Labor Standards Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2010 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs Motion for Circulation of Notice of the Pendency of this Action Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 261(b) and Other Relief 44 is GRANTED. Counsel for the parties shall meet and confer in a good faith effort to arrive at a mutually accepta ble form of notice, and shall submit a stipulation and proposed form of order no later than 10/11/10 in the event they are able to agree. In the event they are unable to agree, counsel shall have until 10/11/10 in which to submit a joint report ident ifying the portions of the notice on which they are unable to agree, and their competing proposals with respect to any portions of the notice on which they are unable to agree. Defendants shall have until 10/18/10 in which to provide Plaintiffs with the names, addresses, phone numbers, and email addresses of the proposed class members. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 9/30/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
February 25, 2011 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 90 Motion for Summary Judgment, Granting 97 Motion to Strike, and Striking 92 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/25/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
May 19, 2011 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 117 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendants shall have until 6/3/11 to provide Plaintiffs with the names, addresses, phone numbers, and e-mail addresses of the proposed class members. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/19/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 22, 2011 204 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 129 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' State Law-Based Claims for Relief, Denying 139 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, Denying 142 Motion for Summary Judgment, Denying as Moot 157 Motion to Strike, Denying 170 Motion for Summary Judgment, and Denying 195 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/22/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
March 20, 2012 217 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 216 Motion to File Specified Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 3/20/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 11, 2013 252 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 249 Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class and Collective Action Settlement. The Final Approval Hearing is set for 5/21/2014 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/11/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
June 18, 2014 262 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Enhancement Payments totaling $127,500.00 to be paid and distributed to the 13 Named Plaintiffs.The Court hereby awards Class Counsel attorneys' fees in the amount of $1,236,500.00, and costs and expenses in the amount of $76,759.29. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 14, 2009 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 30 Motion to Amend and Certify Order. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/14/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucas et al v. Bell Trans
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Lucas
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Castello
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian Melton
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leavon Smith
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Greene
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell Trans
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]