McEwen v. Accelerated Commercial Consultants et al

 
Case Number: 2:2009cv02173
Filed: November 12, 2009
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization Office
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2011 130 Featured Case ORDER Granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion for Summary Judgment. The motion is granted as to Plaintiffs' negligence-based claims (counts eight, ten, and eleven), constructive fraud claim (count twelve), and breach of fiduciary duty claim (count fourteen). The motion is denied in all other respects. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a proposed joint pretrial order no later than 3/4/2011. FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Lawrence Leavitt for a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 2/4/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 4, 2012 147 Featured Case ORDER Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Vincent C. Ferenbach for a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 6/4/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
September 13, 2012 169 Featured Case ORDER that Plaintiff McEwen and Defendant Mastrangelo must file a Stipulation for Dismissal on or before October 19, 2012. FURTHER ORDERED that the settlement conference scheduled for Friday, September 14, 2012 at 11:00 a.m. is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/13/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 12, 2012 182 Featured Case ORDER Granting 171 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk shall forthwith enter Judgment in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendants Frank Ulbright and Terry Pritchett. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 10/12/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 16, 2012 187 Featured Case ORDER that the $1,000 sanction against Defendant Ulbright, as ordered on 9/26/12 (#177) is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/16/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 24, 2012 192 Featured Case ORDER that the parties shall file a status report on any remaining claims against Defendant Accelerated Commercial Consultants on or before November 2, 2012. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 10/24/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 31, 2012 196 Featured Case ORDER Granting 194 Motion to Dismiss. The calendar call set for November 14, 2012 and the trial set for November 20, 2012 are hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 10/31/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 19, 2010 53 Featured Case ORDER Granting 34 Motion to Set Aside Default and Denying 19 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 4/19/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
April 19, 2010 54 Featured Case ORDER Granting 34 & 41 Motions to Quash Writs of Attachment. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 4/19/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
August 12, 2010 79 Featured Case ORDER Granting 49 First MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 8/11/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McEwen v. Accelerated Commercial Consultants et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]