Malloy et al v. SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.

Plaintiff: Edgar H. Malloy and Edgar W. Malloy
Defendant: SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv00908
Filed: June 14, 2010
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 22, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 17 Motion to Strike and Granting 18 Motion to Extend Time. Discovery due by 3/4/2011. Motions due by 4/4/2011. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/6/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt on 11/22/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
April 14, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling 26 Objection to 24 Order. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 4/14/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
April 2, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON STIPULTION Granting 48 Stipulation to Dismiss with prejudice. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 4/2/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malloy et al v. SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar H. Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar W. Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Karie N Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.