Righthaven LLC v. Mostofi

Defendant: Dean Mostofi
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Case Number: 2:2010cv01066
Filed: June 30, 2010
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 11 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/22/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
April 19, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant shall file his Certificate as to Interested Parties, which fully complies with LR 7.1-1 no later than 4/29/11. Failure to comply may result in the issuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/19/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
June 17, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 26 Defendant's Motion to Stay the Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/17/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 13, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant Dean Mostofi's 25 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 7/13/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
October 6, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants Motion for Enlargement of Time 37 is DENIED. Defendants Motion for Attorneys Fees 41 is DENIED as untimely. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/6/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Righthaven LLC v. Mostofi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Mostofi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Represented By: John Charles Coons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]