In re Seven Crown, dba Seven Crown Resorts, a Nevada LLC, as owner of a certain 1986 houseboat manufactured by Master Fabricators; Summit Model; Echo Bay rental No. 224, for exoneration from or limita

In Re: 1986 houseboat manufactured by Master Fabricators; Summit Model; Echo Bay rental No. 224
Plaintiff: In re Seven Crown, dba Seven Crown Resorts, a Nevada LLC, as owner of a certain 1986 houseboat manufactured by Master Fabricators; Summit Model; Echo Bay rental No. 224, for exoneration from or limita
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv01149
Filed: July 13, 2010
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
 
Nature of Suit: Marine Product Liability
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER IN ADMIRALTY Regarding Notice of Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 10/12/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
October 15, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE AND RESTRAINING SUITS. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 10/15/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
March 7, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 20 Claimants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 1 Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 3/7/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 19, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion to Deposit Funds. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Seven Crown shall deposit funds by means of acashier's check with the Clerk of this Court as follows:$40,000.00 as the ALLEGED value of Seven Crown's interest in the vessel at issue in this lawsuit; and $1,000.00 as security for costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt on 7/19/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: In re Seven Crown, dba Seven Crown Resorts, a Nevada LLC, as owner of a certain 1986 houseboat manufactured by Master Fabricators; Summit Model; Echo Bay rental No. 224, for exoneration from or limita
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: 1986 houseboat manufactured by Master Fabricators; Summit Model; Echo Bay rental No. 224
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: In re Seven Crown, dba Seven Crown Resorts, a Nevada LLC, as owner of a certain 1986 houseboat manufactured by Master Fabricators; Summit Model; Echo Bay rental No. 224, for exoneration from or limita
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]