Evans v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Plaintiff: Charde Evans
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv01224
Filed: July 22, 2010
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2010 21 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt, on 10/19/2010. By Deputy Clerk: Carol DePino. 9 Motion to Consolidate Cases is DENIED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
October 29, 2010 27 Featured Case ORDER that defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.s motion to dismiss is hereby GRANTED. The defendant shall prepare an appropriate order outlining which claims overlap with the settlement and should be dismissed. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/29/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
November 17, 2010 33 Featured Case ORDER Granting 18 MOTION to Dismiss Motion for Partial Dismissal And/Or In The Alternative For Partial Summary Judgment filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/17/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 12, 2013 48 Featured Case ORDER Denying as moot 39 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/12/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 24, 2014 60 Featured Case ORDER Granting Defendant's 52 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's 49 Renewed Motion for Class Certification is Denied as moot. The clerk shall enter judgment and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/24/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 15, 2014 66 Featured Case ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 62 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Evans v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charde Evans
Represented By: R. Craig Clark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]