Righthaven LLC v. DiBiase Featured Case

Defendant: Thomas A. DiBiase
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv01343
Filed: August 9, 2010
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 4, 2011 49 MOTION to Seal Defendant-Counterclaimant Thomas A. DiBiase's Motion to File Under Seal by Counter Claimant Thomas A. DiBiase, Defendant Thomas A. DiBiase. Motion ripe 5/4/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Volkmer, Bart)
May 4, 2011 48 DECLARATION of Bart E. Volkmer re 47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Redacted Version of Defendant-Counterclaimant Thomas A. DiBiase's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction ; filed by Counter Claimant Thomas A. DiBiase, Defendant Thomas A. DiBiase. Redacted Version of Declaration of Bart E. Volkmer in Support of Defendant Thomas A. DiBiase's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Volkmer, Bart)
May 4, 2011 47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Redacted Version of Defendant-Counterclaimant Thomas A. DiBiase's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction by Counter Claimant Thomas A. DiBiase, Defendant Thomas A. DiBiase. Responses due by 5/21/2011. (Volkmer, Bart)
April 19, 2011 46 Featured Case ORDER Granting 43 Motion to Withdraw Attorney, Anne Pieroni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/15/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 15, 2011 45 Featured Case ORDER Denying 27 Motion to Dismiss and Granting in part and Denying in part 17 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 4/15/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 11, 2011 44 Interim STATUS REPORT by Counter Claimant Thomas A. DiBiase, Defendant Thomas A. DiBiase. (Volkmer, Bart)
April 6, 2011 43 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney with Certificate of Service by Anne Pieroni. by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC, Counter Defendant Righthaven LLC. Motion ripe 4/6/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw)(Pieroni, Anne)
April 5, 2011 42 Featured Case ORDER ON STIPULATION Denying Paragraph nine on page five on 41 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/30/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 29, 2011 41 STIPULATION [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order by Counter Claimant Thomas A. DiBiase, Defendant Thomas A. DiBiase. (Volkmer, Bart)
February 21, 2011 40 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Anne Pieroni on behalf of Plaintiff Righthaven LLC, Counter Defendant Righthaven LLC. with Certificate of Service (Pieroni, Anne)
January 17, 2011 39 REPLY to Response to 27 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim Or, Alternatively, to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) ; filed by Counter Defendant Righthaven LLC. (Mangano, Shawn)
January 7, 2011 38 DECLARATION of Bart E. Volkmer re 27 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim Or, Alternatively, to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) ; filed by Counter Claimant Thomas A. DiBiase, Defendant Thomas A. DiBiase. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Bart E. Volkmer)(Volkmer, Bart)
January 7, 2011 37 RESPONSE to 27 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim Or, Alternatively, to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f), filed by Counter Claimant Thomas A. DiBiase, Defendant Thomas A. DiBiase. Replies due by 1/17/2011. (Bal, Colleen)
December 16, 2010 36 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER re 34 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 7/22/2011. Motions due by 8/21/2011. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/16/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/16/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 15, 2010 35 REPLY to Response to 17 MOTION to Dismiss & Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Defendant Thomas A. DiBiase. (Opsahl, Kurt) Modified text on 1/5/2011 (SRK).
December 13, 2010 34 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. (Mangano, Shawn)
December 9, 2010 33 Featured Case ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 32 Stipulation to Extend Time to file Response and Reply to 27 MOTION to Dismiss COUNTERCLAIM OR, ALTERNATIVELY, TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) AND FED. R. CIV. P. 12(F). Response due by 1/7/2011. Reply due by 1/21/2011. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 12/9/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 8, 2010 32 STIPULATION re 27 MOTION to Dismiss COUNTERCLAIM OR, ALTERNATIVELY, TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) AND FED. R. CIV. P. 12(F) ; Corrected Stipulation and Order to Extend Time for Counterclaimant to File Response to Motion to Dismiss & Counter-defendant to File a Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss by Counter Claimant Thomas A. DiBiase, Defendant Thomas A. DiBiase. (Volkmer, Bart)
December 8, 2010 31 STIPULATION re 27 MOTION to Dismiss COUNTERCLAIM OR, ALTERNATIVELY, TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) AND FED. R. CIV. P. 12(F) ; Stipulation and Order to Extend Time for Counterclaimant to File Response to Motion to Dismiss & Counter-defendant to File a Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss by Counter Claimant Thomas A. DiBiase, Defendant Thomas A. DiBiase. (Volkmer, Bart)
December 2, 2010 30 DECLARATION re 17 MOTION to Dismiss & Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ; filed by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. (Mangano, Shawn)
December 2, 2010 29 RESPONSE to 17 MOTION to Dismiss & Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, filed by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. Replies due by 12/12/2010. (Mangano, Shawn)
December 1, 2010 28 REPLY ANSWER to 19 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, filed by Righthaven LLC.(Mangano, Shawn)
December 1, 2010 27 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim Or, Alternatively, to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) by Counter Defendant Righthaven LLC. Responses due by 12/18/2010. (Mangano, Shawn) Modified text on 1/5/2011 (SRK).
November 24, 2010 26 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Shawn A. Mangano added. Attorney Steven A. Gibson terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/18/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
November 15, 2010 25 Featured Case ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 23 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer to Counterclaim and Response and Reply to 17 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 11/15/10. Responses due by 12/1/2010. Replies due by 12/15/2010. Righthaven LLC answer due 12/1/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
November 12, 2010 24 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL BY STIPULATION. (Mangano, Shawn)
November 12, 2010 23 STIPULATION re 19 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, ; STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR COUNTERDEFENDANT TO FILE ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM AND RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. (Coons, John)
November 8, 2010 22 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Thomas A. DiBiase. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Opsahl, Kurt)
November 1, 2010 21 Featured Case ORDER Granting 16 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bart E. Volkmer and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Attorney Chad A. Bowers for Thomas A. DiBiase. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 11/1/10. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
November 1, 2010 20 Featured Case ORDER Granting 15 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Colleen Bal and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Chad A. Bowers for Thomas A. DiBiase. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 11/1/10. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
October 29, 2010 19 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand ( Certificate of Interested Parties due by 11/8/2010., Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/13/2010.), COUNTERCLAIM against Righthaven LLC filed by Thomas A. DiBiase. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service to Answer and Counterclaim, Motion to Dismiss, Declaration in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Exhibits, and Request for Judicial Notice)(Opsahl, Kurt) Modified to reflect correct filing party on 11/1/2010 (RFJ).
October 29, 2010 18 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re 17 MOTION to Dismiss & Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ; by Defendant Thomas A. DiBiase. (Opsahl, Kurt)
October 29, 2010 17 MOTION to Dismiss & Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Defendant Thomas A. DiBiase. Responses due by 11/15/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Declaration)(Opsahl, Kurt)
October 29, 2010 16 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Bart E. Volkmer and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Chad A. Bowers (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1781197) filed by Defendant Thomas A. DiBiase. Motion ripe 10/29/2010. (Opsahl, Kurt)
October 29, 2010 15 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Colleen Bal and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Chad A. Bowers (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1781163) filed by Defendant Thomas A. DiBiase. Motion ripe 10/29/2010. (Opsahl, Kurt)
October 19, 2010 14 Featured Case ORDER Granting 12 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Corynne McSherry and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Attorney Chad Bowers for Thomas A. DiBiase. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 10/19/10. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
October 19, 2010 13 Featured Case ORDER Granting 11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kurt Opsahl and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Attorney Chad Bowers for Thomas A. DiBiase. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 10/19/10. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
October 18, 2010 12 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Corynne McSherry and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Chad Bowers (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1768846) filed by Defendant Thomas A. DiBiase. Motion ripe 10/18/2010. (Bowers, Chad)
October 18, 2010 11 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kurt Opsahl and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Chad Bowers (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1768844) filed by Defendant Thomas A. DiBiase. Motion ripe 10/18/2010. (Bowers, Chad)
October 18, 2010 10 Featured Case ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 9 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint. Thomas A. DiBiase answer due 10/29/2010. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 10/18/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
October 15, 2010 9 STIPULATION to extend time to file responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint by Defendant Thomas A. DiBiase. (Bowers, Chad)
September 28, 2010 8 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 7 Stipulation to Extend Deadline. Thomas A. DiBiase answer due 10/15/2010. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 9/28/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
September 27, 2010 7 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendant Thomas A. DiBiase. (ASB)
September 17, 2010 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Righthaven LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Net Sortie Systems, LLC, Corporate Parent SI Content Monitor LLC for Righthaven LLC added.. (Coons, John)
September 14, 2010 5 Featured Case ORDER for Certificate of Interested Parties. IT IS ORDERED that counsel for Plaintiff shall have a period of 10 calendar days from the filing date of this order within which to fully comply with the provisions of Local Rule 7.1-1. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/24/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/10/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
August 10, 2010 4 Summons Issued as to Thomas A. DiBiase. (ASB)
August 10, 2010 3 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (ASB)
August 10, 2010 2 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (ASB)
August 9, 2010 Case assigned to Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (ASB)
August 9, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas A. DiBiase (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0978-1701436), filed by Righthaven LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 8/19/2010. Proof of service due by 12/7/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Coons, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Righthaven LLC v. DiBiase
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A. DiBiase
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Represented By: John Charles Coons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]